VA HB1356 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Local planning commission; action on proposed plats, site plans, and development plans; residential use. Requires local planning commissions to use the same approval process for residential development projects as is currently required for commercial development projects.
Title
Local planning commission; action on proposed plats, site plans, and development plans.
Sponsors
Del. David Owen [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2024-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24104831D |
Same As/Similar To
SB296 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0346)