VA HB1355 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0020)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0020)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alternative facility of temporary detention; minors. Establishes the same procedure for transferring custody of a minor who is the subject of a temporary detention order from one facility to another facility that already exists for transferring custody of adults.
Title
Minors; alternative facility of temporary detention.
Sponsors
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0020) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 20 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-19 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 26, 2018 | |
2018-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2018 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1355ER) |
2018-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104118D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 340.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 340.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |