VA HB1353 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0318)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0318)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Federal acts; meat and poultry. Updates existing Code references to the Federal Meat Inspection Act and the federal Poultry Products Inspection Act.
Title
Federal acts; meat and poultry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0318) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 318 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1353ER) |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-04 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102699D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 5400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 5401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 5405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |