VA HB1352 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Use of salt and brine; certain highways. Prohibits the Department of Transportation from using salt or brine for stabilization or control of ice or snow on any highway that is part of the primary or secondary state highway system and located in the watershed of the Occoquan River.
Title
Salt and brine; use on certain highways located in watershed of Occoquan River.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Transportation |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Infrastructure and Funding |
2024-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24104882D |
Subjects
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Occoquan River
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors
Occoquan River
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors