VA HB1352 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Solid waste disposal; unpermitted sites and open dumps; regulation and cleanup. Prohibits the disposal of solid waste in an unpermitted facility and provides that the presence of unpermitted solid waste on a person's property is prima facie evidence that the person allowed solid waste to be disposed of on his property without a permit. The bill adds open dumps to the types of site that the Department of Environmental Quality is authorized to require to be cleaned up and provides that the party responsible for such cleanup shall include any party who caused the site to become an open dump or caused the improper management of waste at the site. The bill includes technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid waste disposal; unpermitted sites and open dumps, regulation and cleanup.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 38-N) (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (8-Y 7-N)
2020-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-04HouseVOTE: Passage (61-Y 38-N)
2020-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House (61-Y 38-N)
2020-02-03HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-31HouseRead first time
2020-01-29HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (16-Y 6-N)
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102922D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011402(n/a)See Bill Text
1011408.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback