VA HB1351 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1351

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Temporary detention; evaluation; who may perform. Expands the category of individuals who may evaluate a person who is the subject of an emergency custody order to determine whether the person meets the criteria for temporary detention to include any person described in the definition of "mental health professional" in § 54.1-2400.1 who (i) is skilled in the diagnosis and treatment of mental illness, (ii) has completed a certification program approved by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, and (iii) complies with regulations of the Board of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services related to performance of such evaluations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Temporary detention; expands category of individuals who may evaluate a person.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-02-04HouseContinued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-01-17HouseAssigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103049D

Same As/Similar To

HB1351 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
372808(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback