VA HB1351 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1351
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Temporary detention; evaluation; who may perform. Expands the category of individuals who may evaluate a person who is the subject of an emergency custody order to determine whether the person meets the criteria for temporary detention to include any person described in the definition of "mental health professional" in § 54.1-2400.1 who (i) is skilled in the diagnosis and treatment of mental illness, (ii) has completed a certification program approved by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, and (iii) complies with regulations of the Board of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services related to performance of such evaluations.
Title
Temporary detention; expands category of individuals who may evaluate a person.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103049D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1351 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1351 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1351+hil |