VA HB1351 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Sports Hall of Fame. Creates the Virginia Sports Hall of Fame as a public body with a board of directors (the Board) consisting of 21 members, of whom six are to be members of the House of Delegates, four are to be members of the Senate, six are to be nonlegislative citizen members appointed by the Governor, subject to confirmation by the General Assembly, and five are to be nonlegislative citizen members elected by the Board.
Title
Virginia Sports Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (16-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2016-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-02-12 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2016-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported from General Laws (16-Y 3-N) |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-01-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16104659D |