VA HB1351 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0007)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0007)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Credit unions; Virginia Small Estate Act. Provides that federal credit unions operating in the Commonwealth, to the extent allowable under federal law, shall comply with provisions of the Virginia Small Estate Act requiring a person having possession of an asset belonging to a decedent with a value of no more than $50,000 to pay or deliver that asset to the designated successor of the decedent.
Title
Credit unions, federal; those operating within State to comply with Virginia Small Estate Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0007) | |
2013-02-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 7 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1351ER) |
2013-02-11 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (87-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-15 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2012-11-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2012-11-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101150D |
Same As/Similar To
SB905 (Same As) 2013-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0095)