VA HB135 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0438)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Veterans' benefits. Provides that if any person advertises, arranges, offers, or enters into any assignment of right to receive veterans' pension or retirement benefits, such action constitutes a prohibited practice under the Virginia Consumer Protection Act if such assignment is prohibited or void under specified federal anti-assignment acts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Consumer Protection Act; assignment of right to receive veterans' benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0438)
2020-03-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 438 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-05SenateSigned by President
2020-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-04HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB135ER)
2020-03-04HouseEnrolled
2020-02-27SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-27SenateRead third time
2020-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-22HouseVOTE: (100-Y 0-N)
2020-01-22HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB135H1
2020-01-21HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20105742D-H1
2020-01-21HouseRead second time
2020-01-20HouseRead first time
2020-01-16HouseCommittee substitute printed 20105742D-H1
2020-01-16HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-12-17HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2019-12-17HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100872D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591200.2(n/a)See Bill Text
591201(n/a)See Bill Text
591203(n/a)See Bill Text
591205(n/a)See Bill Text
591206(n/a)See Bill Text
591207(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback