VA HB1345 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0677)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0677)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Line of Duty Act. Revises the Line of Duty Act (the Act) by codifying revisions to the Act from the appropriation act and, among other changes, transferring overall administration of the Act to the Virginia Retirement System (VRS), transferring administration of health insurance benefits under the Act to the Department of Human Resource Management (the Department), and creating separate health benefits plans for beneficiaries under the Act. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2017, except that a final enactment requiring each nonparticipating employer to pay its pro rata share of estimated implementation costs to the VRS and the Department becomes effective July 1, 2016.
Title
Line of Duty Act; revises Act by codifying revisions.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0677) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 677 (effective - see bill) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1345ER) |
2016-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-07 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1345H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16104946D-H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-12 | House | Committee substitute printed 16104946D-H1 |
2016-02-12 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16103506D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 1 | 124.38 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 400.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |