VA HB1345 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0042)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0042)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sales and use tax exemption; certain light bulbs. Expands the list of qualified products that are exempt from sales and use tax during the Energy Star and WaterSense tax holiday to include all Energy Star light bulbs. Under current law, only Energy Star compact fluorescent light bulbs are exempt.
Title
Retail Sales and Use Tax; exemption for certain light bulbs.
Sponsors
Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0042) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 42 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1345ER) |
2015-02-18 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-29 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 13-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (85-Y 13-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-26 | House | Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) |
2015-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-12-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-12-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100746D |