VA HB1343 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Campus police departments; sexual assault reporting. Requires that mutual aid agreements between campus police force and law-enforcement agencies contain provisions requiring either the campus police force or an agency with which it has established a mutual aid agreement to notify the local attorney for the Commonwealth of any investigation involving felony criminal sexual assault occurring on property owned or controlled by the institution of higher education within 48 hours of beginning such investigation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campus police departments; sexual assault reporting.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-10HouseLeft in Education
2015-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2015-01-29HouseAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2015-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2015-01-29HouseReferred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
2015-01-13HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
2014-12-01HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2014-12-01HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101213D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback