VA HB1334 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1334ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Insurance data security; required programs and notifications. Establishes standards for insurance data security and for the investigation of a cybersecurity event and the notification to the Commissioner of Insurance and affected consumers of a cybersecurity event. The bill requires insurers to develop, implement, and maintain a comprehensive written information security program based on an assessment of its risk and that contains administrative, technical, and physical safeguards for the protection of nonpublic information and its information system. The bill requires investigation of potential cybersecurity events and prescribes standards for such investigations. The bill requires, if a cybersecurity event occurs, that an insurer or other entity notify the Commissioner and affected consumers with certain information prescribed by the bill. The bill requires the Commissioner to adopt rules and regulations regarding data security and authorizes the Commissioner to investigate potential violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance data security; required programs and notifications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1334ER)
2020-02-25HouseEnrolled
2020-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20SenateRead third time
2020-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-07HouseVOTE: Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N 1-A)
2020-02-07HousePassed House (99-Y 0-N 1-A)
2020-02-07HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2020-02-07HouseVOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06HousePrinted as engrossed 20104824D-E
2020-02-06HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1334E
2020-02-06HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-06HouseRead second time
2020-02-05HouseRead first time
2020-02-03HouseReported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16HouseAssigned CT & I sub: Communications
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104824D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182186.6(n/a)See Bill Text
382100(n/a)See Bill Text
3824214(n/a)See Bill Text
3824319(n/a)See Bill Text
3824409(n/a)See Bill Text
3824509(n/a)See Bill Text
382600(n/a)See Bill Text
382601(n/a)See Bill Text
382602(n/a)See Bill Text
382612.1(n/a)See Bill Text
382612.2(n/a)See Bill Text
382613(n/a)See Bill Text
382613.2(n/a)See Bill Text
382614(n/a)See Bill Text
382618(n/a)See Bill Text
382620(n/a)See Bill Text
382621(n/a)See Bill Text
382629(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1334
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1334+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1334E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1334ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H2101V0014+HB1334
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H21V0036+HB1334
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0589+HB1334
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0562+HB1334
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0188+HB1334
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0734HB1334+HB1334
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0751HB1334+HB1334

Bill Comments

feedback