VA HB1329 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1329

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Chesapeake Bay Preservation Areas; local ordinances; penalties. Directs localities in Tidewater Virginia to incorporate certain penalties into their ordinances protecting the quality of state waters in Chesapeake Bay Preservation Areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chesapeake Bay Preservation Areas; local governments to designate Areas, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N) (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25SenateContinued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-05HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N)
2020-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 42-N)
2020-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1329H1
2020-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106882D-H1
2020-02-04HouseRead second time
2020-02-03HousePassed by for the day
2020-01-31HouseRead first time
2020-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106882D-H1
2020-01-29HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104205D

Same As/Similar To

HB1329 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62144.15:72(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback