VA HB1328 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Unfaithful delegates; penalty. Provides that an individual representing the Commonwealth at a convention for proposing amendments to the United States Constitution called pursuant to Article V of the United States Constitution who knowingly and intentionally votes for a proposed amendment that is outside the scope of the application calling for the convention is guilty of a Class 5 felony.
Title
Unfaithful delegates; constitutional convention, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2017 in Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (56-Y 43-N) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (55-Y 41-N) (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 10-N) (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 5-N) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (56-Y 43-N) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (55-Y 41-N) (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 10-N) (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 5-N) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-02 | Senate | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Continued to 2017 in Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (56-Y 43-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Passed House (56-Y 43-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (55-Y 41-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 41-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Printed as engrossed 16104146D-E |
2016-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1328E |
2016-02-15 | House | Amendments by Delegate Cline agreed to |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-15 | House | Motion to reconsider pass by for the day agreed to |
2016-02-15 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-12 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 10-N) |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 5-N) |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16104146D |