VA HB1324 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Joint subcommittee of House and Senate Committees on Privileges and Elections to review gubernatorial appointments; membership. Provides for the Speaker of the House of Delegates to appoint the five delegates on the joint subcommittee of the House and Senate Committees on Privileges and Elections charged with reviewing gubernatorial appointments and for the Senate Committee on Rules to appoint the three senators on the joint subcommittee. Currently, the Chairman of the House Committee on Privileges and Elections appoints the five delegates on the joint subcommittee, and the Chairman of the Senate Committee on Privileges and Elections appoints the three senators on the joint subcommittee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Privileges & Elections, joint subcommittee of House & Senate Committees on; to review appointments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 94-N) (Y: 2 N: 94 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseFailed to pass
2018-03-10HouseNo further action taken
2018-03-08SenateSenators: McDougle, Norment, Reeves
2018-03-08SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-03-08HouseDelegates: Cole, Rush, Bagby
2018-03-08HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-03-08HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-03-07SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-03-07SenateSenate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 94-N)
2018-03-06HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 18107855D-S1 (2-Y 94-N)
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-05SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1324S1
2018-03-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107855D-S1
2018-03-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-03-05SenateRead third time
2018-03-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107855D-S1
2018-02-28SenateReported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-26SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-23HouseRead first time
2018-01-19HouseReported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
2018-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-01-10HousePresented and ordered printed 18102308D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22106(n/a)See Bill Text
22107(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback