VA HB1323 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0555)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Military surplus motor vehicles; registration and operation on highways. Authorizes the Department of Motor Vehicles to issue a registration card and license plates for military surplus motor vehicles, as defined in the bill. The bill limits the use and travel distance of military surplus motor vehicles and provides that any law-enforcement officer may require any person operating a military surplus motor vehicle to provide the address at which the vehicle is stored for use and the destination of such operation. The bill exempts military surplus motor vehicles from emissions standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military surplus motor vehicles; registration and operation on highways, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0555)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 555 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1323ER)
2018-03-08HouseEnrolled
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HouseSenate substitute with amendment agreed to by House 18107912D-S2 (96-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-05SenatePassed Senate with substitute with amendment (36-Y 4-N)
2018-03-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute with amendment HB1323S2
2018-03-05SenateAmendment by Senator DeSteph agreed to
2018-03-05SenateReading of amendment waived
2018-03-05SenatePassed by temporarily
2018-03-05SenateSubstitute by Senator Carrico agreed to 18107912D-S2
2018-03-05SenateFloor substitute printed 18107912D-S2 (Carrico)
2018-03-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-03-05SenateCommittee substitute rejected 18107669D-S1
2018-03-05SenateRead third time
2018-03-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107669D-S1
2018-02-28SenateReported from Transportation with substitute (11-Y 2-N)
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-12HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-09HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1323H1
2018-02-09HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18106441D-H1
2018-02-09HouseRead second time
2018-02-08HouseRead first time
2018-02-06HouseCommittee substitute printed 18106441D-H1
2018-02-06HouseReported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2018-01-10HousePresented and ordered printed 18101470D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462100(n/a)See Bill Text
4621158.01(n/a)See Bill Text
4621179(n/a)See Bill Text
462711(n/a)See Bill Text
462730.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1323
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1323+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1323H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1323S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1323S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1323ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0555+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1902V0017+HB1323
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H19V0044+HB1323
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0542+HB1323
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S11V0138+HB1323
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0862HB1323+HB1323
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0924HB1323+HB1323
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1376+HB1323

Bill Comments

feedback