VA HB1320 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Excise tax on peanuts. Extends the $0.30 per 100 pounds excise tax on all peanuts grown in and sold in Virginia until July 1, 2016. The proceeds from the tax will be used for promoting the sales and use of Virginia peanuts.
Title
Peanuts; extends excise tax on those grown in and sold in Virginia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006) | |
2013-02-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 6 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1320ER) |
2013-02-11 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance (11-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (87-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-16 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2012-10-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2012-10-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100636D |
Same As/Similar To
SB698 (Same As) 2013-02-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0040)