VA HB1319 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1319
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Beneficial hardwood management practices. Creates a nonrefundable income tax credit for taxable years 2022 through 2026 for expenses incurred by a taxpayer for the implementation of beneficial hardwood management practices. The credit equals the lesser of the actual expenses or $1,000. The bill requires the Tax Commissioner, in coordination with the State Forester, to establish guidelines for claiming the credit and provides that any unused credit may be carried forward by the taxpayer for five taxable years following the taxable year for which the credit was issued. The credit is subject to an aggregate annual cap of $1 million that will be administered by the Department of Forestry on a first-come, first-served basis. Beneficial hardwood management practices. Creates a nonrefundable income tax credit for taxable years 2022 through 2026 for expenses incurred by a taxpayer for the implementation of beneficial hardwood management practices. The credit equals the lesser of the actual expenses or $1,000. The bill requires the Tax Commissioner, in coordination with the State Forester, to establish guidelines for claiming the credit and provides that any unused credit may be carried forward by the taxpayer for five taxable years following the taxable year for which the credit was issued. The credit is subject to an aggregate annual cap of $1 million that will be administered by the Department of Forestry on a first-come, first-served basis.
Title
Beneficial hardwood management practices; creates a nonrefundable income tax credit.
Sponsors
Del. Les Adams [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 7-N 2-A) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 7-N 2-A) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senators: Deeds, Ruff, Vogel |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Delegates: Adams, L.R., Byron, Sullivan |
2022-03-02 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-02 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 99-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 99-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 2-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (14-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (91-Y 7-N 2-A) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (91-Y 7-N 2-A) |
2022-02-14 | House | Printed as engrossed 22101516D-E |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1319E |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2022-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (18-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22101516D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1319 (Carry Over) 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455