VA HB131 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Interstate Compact on Washington Area Professional Football Team Franchise Facility Incentives. Establishes an interstate compact among the Commonwealth of Virginia, the State of Maryland, and the District of Columbia (the party states) that prohibits the party states from providing incentives for a Washington area professional football team franchise facility, including tax incentives, state or local appropriations, and loans. The bill provides that the compact will not become effective unless the party states enact concurring legislation prior to January 1, 2022.
Title
Professional Football Team Franchise Facility Incentives; Interstate Compact on Washington Area.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2019-12-17 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-12-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101034D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB131 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB131+hil |