VA HB1302 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1302
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Deputy sheriffs; minimum salary. Provides that the minimum salary for all deputy sheriffs, both law enforcement and non-law enforcement, shall be set at the compensation board minimum plus a 20 percent supplement. The bill provides that in any locality designated as high or above average according to the Commission on Local Government's Fiscal Stress Index as of July 1, 2020, the Commonwealth shall pay the entire sum of the difference between the current salary paid in such locality and the compensation board minimum plus the 20 percent supplement.
Title
Deputy sheriffs; minimum salary.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Hurst [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-02-11 | House | Continued to 2021 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104937D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1302 (Carry Over) 2020-02-11 - Continued to 2021 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote