VA HB1302 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737)
Summary
Incident management. Redefines the "scene of any accident" for the purposes of arrest without a warrant. The revised definition includes a reasonable location where a vehicle or person involved in an accident has been moved at the direction of a law-enforcement officer to facilitate the clearing of the highway or to ensure the safety of the motoring public. The bill also removes the limitation that the driver of a vehicle involved in an accident may move the vehicle only "so far as necessary" to prevent obstructing traffic.
Title
Incident management; makes several changes to law in order to increase effectiveness & efficiency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 737 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1302ER) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 081571654-S1 (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1302S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 081571654-S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 081571654-S1 | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Rereferred to Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-07 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-07 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-06 | House: Printed as engrossed 081173828-E | |
2008-02-06 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1302E | |
2008-02-06 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-06 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-05 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-01 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-01-24 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-24 | House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081173828 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1302 |