VA HB1301 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Office of the Children's Ombudsman established. Establishes the Office of the Children's Ombudsman as a means of effecting changes in policy, procedure, and legislation; educating the public; investigating and reviewing actions of the State Department of Social Services, local departments of social services, child-placing agencies, or child-caring institutions; and monitoring and ensuring compliance with relevant statutes, rules, and policies pertaining to children's protective services and the placement, supervision, treatment, and improvement of delivery of care to children in foster care and adoptive homes. The Office of the Children's Ombudsman is headed by the Children's Ombudsman, who is appointed for a term of four years by the Governor and subject to confirmation by the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children's Ombudsman, Office of the; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-19SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108532D-S1
2020-02-19SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1301H2
2020-02-10HouseCommittee on Courts of Justice substitute agreed to 20107930D-H2
2020-02-10HouseCommittee on General Laws substitute rejected 20105383D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107930D-H2
2020-02-07HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-05HouseReferred from Appropriations by voice vote
2020-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-04HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04HouseCommittee substitute printed 20105383D-H1
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Adminstrative Process
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102686D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22438(n/a)See Bill Text
22448(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1301
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1301+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1301H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1301H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1301S1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1101V0051+HB1301
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0260+HB1301
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H08V0218+HB1301
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0927+HB1301
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0203+HB1301
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0480+HB1301

Bill Comments

feedback