VA HB1301 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Compensation and expenses of electoral board members and general registrars. Provides for reimbursement to the localities of the whole amount of compensation and expenses of electoral board members and general registrars, notwithstanding any provision of the general appropriation act to the contrary.
Title
Electoral board members and general registrars; compensation and expenses.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 4-N) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 4-N) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-21 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) |
2015-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance |
2014-11-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-11-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100623D |