VA HB1297 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia-Israel Advisory Board; transfer to legislative branch. Transfers the Virginia-Israel Advisory Board (the Board) from the executive branch to the legislative branch. The bill also changes the membership of the Board by increasing the number of citizen appointments by the Speaker of the House of Delegates from six to 10 and the number of citizen appointments by the Senate Committee on Rules from six to 10 and by decreasing the number of appointments of the Governor from 13 to five. The Joint Rules Committee appoints the executive director to the Board. Funding for the costs of expenses of the members and the operations of the Board, including staffing needs, are made from such funds as appropriated by the General Assembly. The Virginia-Israel Advisory Board is currently an advisory board in the executive branch of government staffed by the Office of the Governor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia-Israel Advisory Board; reorganizes as Virginia-Israel Advisory Authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (2-Y 94-N 1-A) (Y: 2 N: 94 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 697 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President
2018-03-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1297ER)
2018-03-20HouseEnrolled
2018-03-10HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-03-10HouseConference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-03-10HouseConference substitute printed 18108275D-H2
2018-03-10 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2018-03-10SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2018-03-08SenateSenators: McDougle, Norment, Reeves
2018-03-08SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-03-08HouseDelegates: Hugo, Rush, Bourne
2018-03-08HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-03-08HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-03-08SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-03-08SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HouseVOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 94-N 1-A)
2018-03-07HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 18107577D-S1 (2-Y 94-N 1-A)
2018-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-06SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1297S1
2018-03-06SenateRead third time
2018-03-05SenatePassed by for the day
2018-03-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107577D-S1
2018-03-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-03-05SenateRead third time
2018-03-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107577D-S1
2018-02-28SenateReported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1297H1
2018-02-12HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18106908D-H1
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-10HouseRead first time
2018-02-08HouseCommittee substitute printed 18106908D-H1
2018-02-08HouseReported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2018-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103296D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222351(n/a)See Bill Text
222354(n/a)See Bill Text
222424(n/a)See Bill Text
222425(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1297
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1297+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1297H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1297S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1297H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1297ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0697+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H20V0091+HB1297
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0751+HB1297
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S10V0144+HB1297
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0862HB1297+HB1297
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0973HB1297+HB1297
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1460+HB1297
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1065HB1297+HB1297
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1222HB1297+HB1297
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1577+HB1297

Bill Comments

feedback