VA HB1293 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1293
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Continued to 2021 in Transportation by voice vote
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Continued to 2021 in Transportation by voice vote
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Extension of Shirley Gate Road; funding. Prohibits the use of state funds for the extension of Shirley Gate Road in Fairfax County until the intersection at Popes Head Road and Fairfax County Parkway has been redesigned and the traffic light removed.
Title
Shirley Gate Road; extension in Fairfax County, funding.
Sponsors
Del. Dan Helmer [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - House - House: Stricken from docket by Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | Continued to 2021 in Transportation by voice vote |
2020-01-30 | House | Reconsidered by Transportation |
2020-01-28 | House | Stricken from docket by Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101490D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1293 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Continued to 2021 in Transportation by voice vote