VA HB1290 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0626)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0626)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public bodies; security of government databases and data communications. Requires every public body to report to the Virginia Fusion Intelligence Center all known incidents that threaten the security of the Commonwealth's data or communications or result in exposure of data protected by federal or state laws and all other incidents compromising the security of the public body's information technology systems with the potential to cause major disruption to normal activities of the public body or other public bodies. The bill requires such reports to be made to the Virginia Fusion Intelligence Center within 24 hours of the discovery of the incident and that the Virginia Fusion Intelligence Center share such reports with the Chief Information Officer promptly upon receipt. The bill requires the Chief Information Officer to convene a work group to review current cybersecurity reporting and information sharing practices and report any legislative recommendations to the Governor and the Chairmen of the Senate Committee on General Laws and Technology and the House Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation by November 15, 2022.
Title
Public bodies; security of government databases and data communications, report.
Sponsors
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 7-N) (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendment(s) (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 7-N) (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendment(s) (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0626) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 626 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1290ER) |
2022-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (93-Y 7-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (93-Y 7-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1290H1 |
2022-02-04 | House | Substitute by Delegate Hayes agreed to 22106070D-H1 |
2022-02-04 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2022-02-04 | House | Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation amendment rejected |
2022-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-04 | House | Floor substitute printed 22106070D-H1 (Hayes) |
2022-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-31 | House | Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendment(s) (19-Y 2-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2022-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22103585D |
Same As/Similar To
SB764 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0627)
SB764 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0627)
SB764 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0627)
Subjects
Administration of Government
Computer Services and Uses
Databases
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Computer Services and Uses
Databases
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 5514 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |