VA HB1289 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - Failed to report (defeated) in Labor and Commerce (7-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Humane Cosmetics Act; civil penalties. Prohibits testing cosmetics on animals in the Commonwealth effective July 1, 2021. The bill also prohibits the sale in the Commonwealth effective July 1, 2023, of any cosmetic that was developed or manufactured using animal testing on or after July 1, 2021. Violations are subject to a civil penalty not to exceed $10,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Humane Cosmetics Act; civil penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Labor and Commerce (7-Y 9-N) (Y: 7 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-04HouseFailed to report (defeated) in Labor and Commerce (7-Y 9-N)
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102048D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591571(n/a)See Bill Text
591573(n/a)See Bill Text
593572(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback