VA HB1288 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1288

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Purchase, possession, or transportation of firearms following conviction for assault and battery of a family or household member; permit to restore rights; penalties. Prohibits a person who has been convicted of stalking, sexual battery, assault and battery of a family or household member, or assault and battery when the person intentionally selects the person against whom a simple assault is committed because of his race, religious conviction, color, or national origin from purchasing, possessing, or transporting a firearm. A person who violates this provision is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill provides for a process by which a person convicted of such crime may petition the circuit court for a reinstatement of his right to possess or transport a firearm and the factors a court shall consider in determining such reinstatement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; purchase, possession, etc., following certain convictions, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04SenateLeft in Judiciary
2020-02-24SenateContinued to 2021 in Judiciary (12-Y 3-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (52-Y 47-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1288H1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107549D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseIncorporates HB459 (Sullivan)
2020-02-07HouseIncorporates HB900 (Levine)
2020-02-07HouseIncorporates HB78 (Kory)
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107549D-H1
2020-02-07HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (11-Y 9-N)
2020-02-04HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2020-01-27HouseAssigned PS sub: Firearms
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102171D

Same As/Similar To

HB1288 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (12-Y 3-N)
HB78 (Similar To) 2020-02-11 - Left in Public Safety
HB459 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Left in Public Safety
HB900 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Left in Public Safety

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.09(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.1:6(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:1(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:2(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:3(n/a)See Bill Text
192386.28(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback