VA HB1288 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - House: Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions (HB512-Rust) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - House: Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions (HB512-Rust) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Lyme disease; reporting; registry. Provides that the Board of Health shall include Lyme disease on the list of diseases required to be reported, and directs the Department of Health to develop a Lyme Disease Registry to collect information about reported incidents of Lyme disease.
Title
Lyme disease; Board of Health shall include on list of diseases required to be reported.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB512-Rust) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | House: Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions (HB512-Rust) by voice vote | |
2010-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB512-Rust) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #1 | |
2010-01-21 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-01-21 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10103684D |