VA HB1286 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Continued to 2017 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Distributed and renewable generation of electric energy; net energy metering and third party purchase agreements. Exempts generators that are not organized as a public service company and that provide electric energy from renewable energy to retail customers under certain power purchase agreements from being defined as a public utility or a supplier. The measure authorizes retail customers to purchase electric energy from such generators provided that the renewable energy electricity generation source is located on property owned, leased, or otherwise controlled by the retail customer or any affiliated person. The net energy metering programs are amended to remove the one percent cap relative to total utility sales for net metered facilities. The State Corporation Commission is directed to establish separate net energy metering programs for eligible multi-meter customer-generators, who are customers that own or operate, or contracts with another person to own or operate, or both, a renewable energy generating facility that uses as its sole energy source solar power, wind power, or aerobic or anaerobic digester gas, does not have an aggregate generation capacity of more than one megawatt, and is used primarily to provide energy to metered accounts of the customer. The measure amends the Commonwealth's energy policy by adding the goals of encouraging private sector distributed renewable energy, increasing security of the electricity grid by supporting distributed renewable energy projects, and augmenting the exercise of private property rights by landowners desiring to generate their own energy from renewable energy sources on their lands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distributed and renewable generation of electric energy; net energy metering.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-11HouseContinued to 2017 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
2016-02-09HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote
2016-01-26HouseAssigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy
2016-01-20HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2016-01-20HousePresented and ordered printed 16103518D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback