VA HB1285 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0640)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0640)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation project selection in Planning District 8 (Northern Virginia); public meeting. Requires the Northern Virginia Transportation Authority, the Northern Virginia Transportation Commission, the Virginia Railway Express, and the Commonwealth Transportation Board to annually conduct a joint public meeting for the purposes of presenting to the public, and receiving public comments on, the transportation projects proposed by each entity in Planning District 8.
Title
Transportation project selection in Northern Virginia; public meeting.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0640) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 640 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1285ER) |
2018-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-07 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Wexton agreed to |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (11-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104576D |