VA HB1285 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Continued to 2017 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Community energy programs. Authorizes investor-owned electric utilities and electric cooperatives to establish a community energy program with a community subscriber organization. Under a community energy program, community subscribers and community subscriber organizations may participate in community net energy metering with mutually agreed community subscriber payment rates and community subscriber credit rates. A community subscriber (i) acquires a subscription that entitles him to a proportional interest in a renewable energy generation facility and (ii) receives a credit on his electric utility bill based on the community subscriber credit rate multiplied by his share of the facility's output.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community energy programs; investor-owned electric utilities and electric cooperatives to establish.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-11HouseContinued to 2017 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
2016-02-09HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote
2016-01-26HouseAssigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy
2016-01-20HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2016-01-20HousePresented and ordered printed 16104410D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback