VA HB1283 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Registration of tobacco products retailers; purchase, possession, and sale of tobacco products; penalties. The bill prohibits any person from selling any tobacco product at retail (i) without first obtaining a permit from the Department of Taxation and (ii) at a location within 1,000 feet of a youth-oriented facility, defined in the bill. The bill prohibits Internet sales of tobacco products, except to a permit-holding retailer, and prohibits the sale of tobacco products from vending machines. The bill imposes civil penalties of up to $1,500 for selling tobacco products without a permit and up to $2,000 for selling tobacco products to persons under age 21. Permits would be subject to annual renewal and subject to revocation for violations of federal, state, or local laws related to tobacco products. The bill imposes recordkeeping requirements and makes it a Class 1 misdemeanor to engage in fraud or misrepresentation in connection with an application for a permit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tobacco products retailers; registration, purchase, possession, and sale of products, penalties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05HouseContinued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed to LIS only 20107293D-H1
2020-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-01-29HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3
2020-01-27HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-01-27HouseReferred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
2020-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Finance by voice vote
2020-01-20HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105166D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182246.8(n/a)See Bill Text
182371.2(n/a)See Bill Text
182391(n/a)See Bill Text
221206(n/a)See Bill Text
221279.6(n/a)See Bill Text
22179.5(n/a)See Bill Text
5811021.04:1(n/a)See Bill Text
5811030.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5811030.6(n/a)See Bill Text
591293.10(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback