VA HB1279 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; policies for the award of academic credit for military training. Requires the governing board of each public institution of higher education to adopt a policy for the award of academic credit to any student enrolled at the institution who has successfully completed a military training course or program as part of his military service that is applicable to the student's certificate of degree requirements and is recommended for academic credit by a national higher education association that provides academic credit recommendations for military training courses or programs, noted on the student's military transcript issued by any of the Armed Forces of the United States or otherwise documented in writing by any of the Armed Forces of the United States.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; policy for award of academic credit for military training.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Tran [D] | Del. David Reid [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Education |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104506D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 1 | 2907 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 904.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |