VA HB1278 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0108)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Conveyance of certain property; conditions. Authorizes the Department of Wildlife Resources to convey certain property to the Shenandoah Valley Battlefields Foundation. Any deed of conveyance shall include a condition that the property be open to public use, including public fishing, and shall provide that the property shall revert to the Commonwealth if the condition is not met. Conveyance of certain property; conditions. Authorizes the Department of Wildlife Resources to convey certain property to the Shenandoah Valley Battlefields Foundation. Any deed of conveyance shall include a condition that the property be open to public use, including public fishing, and shall provide that the property shall revert to the Commonwealth if the condition is not met.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wildlife Resources, Board of; conveyance of certain property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-06 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0108)
2022-04-06 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 108 (effective 7/1/22)
2022-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
2022-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022
2022-03-04SenateSigned by President
2022-03-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2022-03-03HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1278ER)
2022-03-03HouseEnrolled
2022-02-28SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2022-02-28SenateRead third time
2022-02-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2022-02-23SenateReported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2022-02-16SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2022-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2022-02-15HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2022-02-15HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2022-02-14HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1278H1
2022-02-14HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 22106415D-H1
2022-02-14HouseRead second time
2022-02-11HouseRead first time
2022-02-09HouseCommittee substitute printed 22106415D-H1
2022-02-09HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2022-02-01HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2022-02-01HouseReferred from General Laws by voice vote
2022-01-20HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2022-01-20HousePresented and ordered printed 22103293D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+sum+HB1278
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+ful+HB1278+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+ful+HB1278H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+ful+HB1278ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+ful+CHAP0108+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+oth+HB1278F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+oth+HB1278FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+oth+HB1278FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+vot+H01V0046+HB1278
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+vot+HV0868+HB1278
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+vot+S03V0234+HB1278
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+vot+SV0598HB1278+HB1278
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+vot+SV0608HB1278+HB1278

Bill Comments

feedback