VA HB1273 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0634)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0634)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; parity of coverage for oral chemotherapy medications. Provides that each health insurer, health care subscription plan, and health maintenance organization whose policies, contracts, or plans include coverage for intravenously administered, injected, and orally administered anticancer drugs shall provide that the criteria for establishing cost sharing applicable to orally administered cancer chemotherapy drugs and cancer chemotherapy drugs that are administered intravenously or by injection shall be consistently applied within the same plan. This requirement will apply to the state employees' health insurance plan and to the local choice health program.
Title
Chemotherapy; requirements for orally administered cancer drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0634) | |
2012-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 634 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1273ER) | |
2012-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-06 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 12105589D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1273S1 | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105589D-S1 | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105589D-S1 | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1273H3 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Substitute by Delegate Peace agreed to 12105415D-H3 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Floor substitute printed 12105415D-H3 (Peace) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Appropriations Committee substitute rejected 12105362D-H2 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee substitute rejected 12104867D-H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105362D-H2 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement | |
2012-01-31 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-31 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104867D-H1 | |
2012-01-31 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-24 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2012-01-24 | House: Referred from Commerce and Labor by voice vote | |
2012-01-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-20 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12104507D |
Same As/Similar To
SB450 (Same As) 2012-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0641)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3418.18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |