VA HB127 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0539)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0539)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax exemption; spouse of military service member killed in action. Clarifies that "killed in action" includes a determination by the U.S. Department of Defense of "died of wounds received in action" for purposes of the real property tax exemption on the residence of the surviving spouse.
Title
Real property tax; exemption on residence of spouse of military service member killed in action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: VOTE:REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 101 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: VOTE:REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 101 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0539) | |
2016-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 539 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-16 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/16/16 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB127ER) |
2016-03-11 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2016-03-08 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-08 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senators: Cosgrove, Barker, Dunnavant |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2016-03-03 | House | Delegates: Knight, Ware, Aird |
2016-03-03 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2016-03-03 | House | House acceded to request |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | VOTE:REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 16105731D-S1 (1-Y 98-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB127S1 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105731D-S1 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105731D-S1 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB127H1 |
2016-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16104783D-H1 |
2016-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 16104783D-H1 |
2016-02-08 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-12-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-12-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100683D |
Same As/Similar To
SB99 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0347)