VA HB1266 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0521)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Septic system inspectors; requirements to perform a septic system inspection. Authorizes any individual who holds a valid onsite sewage system operator, onsite sewage system installer, or onsite soil evaluator license pursuant to Chapter 23 (Waterworks and Wastewater Works Operators) of Title 54.1 to perform a septic system inspection in connection with any real estate transaction, including refinancings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Septic system inspectors; requirements to perform a septic system inspection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0521)
2020-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 521 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1266ER)
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled
2020-03-02SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02SenateRead third time
2020-02-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-27SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2020-02-21SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2020-02-17SenateRereferred to Education and Health
2020-02-17SenateRereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10HousePrinted as engrossed 20103035D-E
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1266E
2020-02-10HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-06HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-02-04HouseReferred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103035D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591310.10(n/a)See Bill Text
591310.9(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1266&201+sum+HB1266
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1266+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1266E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1266ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0521+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H12V0294+HB1266
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0925+HB1266
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0165+HB1266
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0359+HB1266
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1300HB1266+HB1266
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1384HB1266+HB1266

Bill Comments

feedback