VA HB1262 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of General Services; disposition of surplus motor vehicles. Provides that the Department of General Services shall permit surplus motor vehicles to be donated prior to public sale or auction to Virginia community college educational foundations granted tax-exempt status under §501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code that operate car donation programs that assist low-income students participating in noncredit workforce training programs with overcoming transportation-related barriers to employment.
Title
General Services, Department of; disposition of surplus motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Failed to pass |
2018-03-10 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senators: DeSteph, Black, Ebbin |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Delegates: Toscano, Peace, Garrett |
2018-03-08 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2018-03-08 | House | House acceded to request |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 96-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104633D |