VA HB1257 | 2022 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1257
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0017)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0017)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural gas service; discontinuing service. Requires a municipal corporation to satisfy certain requirements prior to discontinuing natural gas utility services to any residential, commercial, or industrial customer. Natural gas service; discontinuing service. Requires a municipal corporation to satisfy certain requirements prior to discontinuing natural gas utility services to any residential, commercial, or industrial customer.
Title
Natural gas service; municipal corporations providing service, discontinuing service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-17 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0017) | |
2022-08-04 | Governor: of adjournment of the 2022 Special Session l) | |
2022-08-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 17 (effective on the 1st day of the 4th month following the month | |
2022-07-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., August 4, 2022 | |
2022-07-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on July 28, 2022 |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-07-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-07-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1257ER) |
2022-07-20 | House | Enrolled |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2022-03-12 | House | Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455 |
2022-03-12 | House | VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-12 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-12 | House | Conference substitute printed 22107968D-H1 |
2022-03-12 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: McClellan, Morrissey, Stanley |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Kilgore, O'Quinn, Reid |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-10 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 22107334D-S1 (0-Y 98-N) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1257S1 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22107334D-S1 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22107334D-S1 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-14 | House | VOTE: Passage #2 (54-Y 46-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Passed House (54-Y 46-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2022-02-14 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Printed as engrossed 22104724D-E |
2022-02-11 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1257E |
2022-02-11 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (12-Y 10-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104724D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1257 (Carry Over) 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455