VA HB1257 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Sports Authority. Creates the Virginia Sports Authority. The powers and duties of the Virginia Sports Authority include the duty to promote sporting opportunities throughout the state, including by contracting with an existing nonprofit organization, the power to issue bonds and construct facilities, and the power to promulgate regulations for the licensing of commercial entities sponsoring fantasy sports contests. The Governor will appoint three of the members of the Authority, while the Majority Leader of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Delegates will each appoint two members. None of the members shall be legislators. The bill provides that if the Authority issues bonds to finance a facility, the Authority shall be entitled to all state sales and use tax revenues that are levied pursuant to the Virginia Retail Sales and Use Tax Act and that are generated by transactions taking place within the facility for the life of the bonds, not to exceed 30 years. The bill also grants the Authority oversight of the Virginia Professional Boxing, Wrestling and Martial Arts Advisory Board.
Title
Virginia Sports Authority; created.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2014-01-31 | House | Continued to 2015 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2014-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14104174D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 7400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 7408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 831.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1257 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1257+hil |