VA HB1257 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0448)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0448)
Summary
Department of Social Services to establish Intensive Case Monitoring pilot programs for child support enforcement. Authorizes the Department of Social Services to establish Intensive Case Monitoring pilot programs in four judicial districts within the Commonwealth to provide case management and other services to persons referred to the program by the court after failure to pay child support as required by an administrative action. The provisions of this act shall not become effective unless general funds effectuating the purposes of this act are included in the general appropriation act passed by the 2008 Session of the General Assembly, which becomes law.
Title
Child support enforcement; establishing Intensive Case Monitoring pilot programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0448) | |
2008-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 448 (effective - see bill) | |
2008-03-02 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-28 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-28 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1257ER) | |
2008-02-28 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House (95-Y 4-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Printed as engrossed 081134608-E | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1257E | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (24-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-06 | House: Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources (Hamilton) | |
2008-02-05 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-05 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081134608 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1257 |