VA HB1253 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Net energy metering by municipalities. Authorizes municipal renewable energy net metering projects. Participating municipalities are authorized to aggregate the electric energy load of their governmental buildings, facilities, and any other governmental operations requiring the consumption of electric energy for the purpose of net energy metering from a renewable energy generating facility. To be eligible, the generation facility for the municipal renewable energy net metering project shall use as its sole energy source solar power, wind power, or aerobic or anaerobic digester gas and landfill gas; not have an aggregate generation capacity of more than five megawatts unless a utility elects a higher capacity; be located on land owned, leased, or operated by the municipality; be interconnected and operated in parallel with an electric utility's transmission and distribution facilities; and be used primarily to provide energy to metered accounts of the municipality. The aggregated municipal net metered accounts may be served by multiple meters that are located at separate sites.
Title
Electric utility regulation; net energy metering by municipalities.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104514D |