VA HB1250 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0758)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Erosion and Stormwater Management Act; consolidation of programs; opt-out for certain localities; penalties. Combines existing statutory programs relating to soil erosion and stormwater management, directing the State Water Control Board (the Board) to permit, regulate, and control both erosion and stormwater runoff. The bill requires any locality that operates a municipal separate storm sewer system (MS4) or a Virginia Stormwater Management Program (VSMP) to adopt a Virginia Erosion and Stormwater Management Program (VESMP) that regulates any land-disturbing activity that disturbs an area of 10,000 square feet or more, or 2,500 square feet or more if in a Chesapeake Bay Preservation Area. A locality that lacks an MS4 and for which the Department of Environmental Quality (DEQ) is currently administering a VSMP is required to (i) adopt such a VESMP, (ii) adopt such a VESMP with DEQ conducting plan review and making recommendations on the compliance of each plan with technical criteria, or (iii) continue to operate a separate Virginia Erosion and Sediment Control Program (VESCP) that regulates any disturbance of 10,000 square feet or more and, in a Preservation Area, regulates a disturbance of 2,500 square feet or more and meets certain other requirements. Any eligible locality that chooses the third option is to have a VSMP administered on its behalf by the Board for any land-disturbing activity that disturbs one acre or more of land, including an activity that disturbs a smaller area but is part of a larger development that results in a disturbance of one acre or more. Towns are afforded additional options in relation to the counties in which they are located. The bill directs certain charges or penalties to the Stormwater Local Assistance Fund, which provides matching grants to local governments for stormwater best management practices. Finally, the bill directs DEQ to evaluate fees related to the consolidated Virginia Erosion and Stormwater Management Program and directs the Board to adopt regulations to carry out the purposes of the bill, delaying the effective date of the bill until the later of July 1, 2017, or 30 days after the adoption of such regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Erosion and Stormwater Management Act; consolidation of programs, opt-out for locations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-20 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0758)
2016-04-20HouseEnacted, Chapter 758 (effective - see bill)
2016-04-20SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2016-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2016-04-20HouseReenrolled bill text (HB1250ER2)
2016-04-20HouseReenrolled
2016-04-20 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2016-04-20SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2016-04-20HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2016-04-20HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
2016-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-03-23HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2016-03-05SenateSigned by President
2016-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2016-03-02HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1250ER)
2016-03-02HouseEnrolled
2016-03-01SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2016-03-01SenateRead third time
2016-02-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2016-02-25SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
2016-02-16SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2016-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2016-02-15HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2016-02-15HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2016-02-12HousePrinted as engrossed 16103814D-E
2016-02-12HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1250E
2016-02-12HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2016-02-12HouseRead second time
2016-02-11HouseRead first time
2016-02-10HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2016-01-19HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2016-01-19HousePresented and ordered printed 16103814D

Same As/Similar To

SB673 (Same As) 2016-02-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0068)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1012500(n/a)See Bill Text
1522403.3(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:24(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:25(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:25.1(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:26(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:27(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:27.1(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:28(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:29(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:29.1(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:30(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:31(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:32(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:33(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:34(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:35(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:36(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:37(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:38(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:39(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:40(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:41(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:42(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:45(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:46(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:47(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:48(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:51.1(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:55(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:56(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:57(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:58(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:60(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:61(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:62(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:65(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:69(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:71(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:74(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.19:22(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.22(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.23(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.25(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.26(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.29(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.3(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.31(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.32(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB1250
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB1250+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB1250E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB1250ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB1250ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+CHAP0758+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H01V0054+HB1250
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV0506+HB1250
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+S01V0085+HB1250
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0718HB1250+HB1250
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0749HB1250+HB1250
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV1437+HB1250
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV1183HB1250+HB1250

Bill Comments

feedback