VA HB1249 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0633)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0633)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Food donations; labeling; liability. Exempts individuals and entities that donate food and charitable organizations that accept food donations from criminal and civil liability for donating or receiving food past its best-by date or other non-safety labels so long as all parties are informed. The bill provides that immunity from liability shall not apply in instances of gross negligence or intentional misconduct. Food donations; labeling; liability. Exempts individuals and entities that donate food and charitable organizations that accept food donations from criminal and civil liability for donating or receiving food past its best-by date or other non-safety labels so long as all parties are informed. The bill provides that immunity from liability shall not apply in instances of gross negligence or intentional misconduct.
Title
Food donations; labeling, liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0633) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 633 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1249ER) |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Printed as engrossed 22106365D-EH1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1249EH1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Amendments by Delegate Davis agreed to |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106365D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106365D-H1 |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104344D |
Subjects
Agriculture Animal Care and Food
Charitable Civic and Volunteer Institutions and Organizations
Hotels Restaurants Summer Camps and Campgrounds
Charitable Civic and Volunteer Institutions and Organizations
Hotels Restaurants Summer Camps and Campgrounds