VA HB1246 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Bonds for institutions of higher learning; emergency. Authorizes issuance of bonds in an amount up to $279,470,000 for revenue-producing capital projects at institutions of higher learning. The bill contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commonwealth of Virginia Higher Educational Institutions Bond Act of 2020; created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-27SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-24HouseVOTE: (99-Y 0-N)
2020-01-24HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-22HouseRead first time
2020-01-20HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned App. sub: Capital Outlay
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/08/20 20104590D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback