VA HB1244 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Telephone Privacy Protection Act. Provides that for the purposes of the Virginia Telephone Privacy Act (the Act), "telephone solicitation call" includes any text message sent to any wireless telephone with a Virginia area code, or to a wireless telephone registered to any natural person who is a resident of the Commonwealth, for the purpose of offering or advertising any property, goods, or services for sale, lease, license, or investment, including offering or advertising an extension of credit or for the purpose of fraudulent activity. The bill prohibits a telephone solicitor from engaging in any conduct that results in the display of false or misleading caller identification information on the called party's telephone. The bill increases the amount of damages and the amount of the civil penalty for violations of the Act from $500 for each such violation to $500 for a first violation, $1,000 for a second violation, and $5,000 for each subsequent violation and increases to $5,000 the maximum civil penalty the court may impose for a willful first or second violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Telephone Privacy Protection Act; telephone solicitation calls.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)
2020-03-10 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 263 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020
2020-03-03HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020
2020-02-26SenateSigned by President
2020-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1244ER)
2020-02-25HouseEnrolled
2020-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20SenateRead third time
2020-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-07HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06HousePrinted as engrossed 20105168D-E
2020-02-06HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1244E
2020-02-06HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-06HouseRead second time
2020-02-05HouseRead first time
2020-02-03HouseReported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16HouseAssigned CT & I sub: Communications
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105168D

Same As/Similar To

SB812 (Same As) 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591510(n/a)See Bill Text
591513(n/a)See Bill Text
591515(n/a)See Bill Text
591517(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1244&201+sum+HB1244
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1244+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1244E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1244ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0263+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H2101V0008+HB1244
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H21V0034+HB1244
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0613+HB1244
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0149+HB1244
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0734HB1244+HB1244
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0751HB1244+HB1244

Bill Comments

feedback