VA HB1240 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0408)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Legal services plans. Authorizes legal services organizations to provide to the Virginia Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services any registration information or fees on behalf of their legal services plan sellers. Currently, sellers are required to register with the Department individually. The measure also (i) allows legal services plans to be written in Virginia by a foreign corporation that is licensed as an insurer in its state of domicile and authorized to write legal services plans under the laws of any state; (ii) authorizes a foreign insurer issuing legal services plans to file financial statements with the State Corporation Commission using certain alternative forms; (iii) allows a legal services organization to use policy forms without prior approval of the Commission if it has filed an informational filing and written notice of its intent to use the form; (iv) allows legal services organizations to exclude the management discussion and analysis sections of their financial statements filed with the Commission; and (v) provides that the Commission may investigate or examine a legal services organization as it deems necessary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legal services plans; registration information or fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0408)
2020-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 408 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2020
2020-03-02SenateSigned by President
2020-02-28HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-28HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1240ER)
2020-02-28HouseEnrolled
2020-02-24HouseVOTE: Adoption (97-Y 2-N)
2020-02-24HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 2-N)
2020-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-02-20SenateAmendment by Senator Saslaw agreed to
2020-02-20SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-20SenateRead third time
2020-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1240H1
2020-01-31HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106498D-H1
2020-01-31HouseRead second time
2020-01-30HouseRead first time
2020-01-28HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
2020-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106498D-H1
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105065D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3821300(n/a)See Bill Text
3821301(n/a)See Bill Text
3821315.1(n/a)See Bill Text
3821317(n/a)See Bill Text
382316(n/a)See Bill Text
3824402.1(n/a)See Bill Text
591441.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1240&201+sum+HB1240
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1240+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1240H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1240ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0408+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0078+HB1240
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0110+HB1240
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0311+HB1240
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0170+HB1240
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0734HB1240+HB1240
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0751HB1240+HB1240
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1233+HB1240

Bill Comments

feedback